CO HB1254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regulation related to the ownership of a vehicle, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Title And Registration Motor Vehicle Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1254 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1254 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1254 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1254, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1254, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1254 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1254 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1254 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1254, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1254, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Governor Vetoed | |
2021-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-27 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |