CO HB1254 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the modification of the foreclosure process on property that is encumbered by a deed of trust.
Title
Public Trustee Deed Of Trust Foreclosure Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1254 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1254 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-03-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |