CO HB1253 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the 'Protection of Vulnerable Adults from Financial Exploitation Act'.
Title
Protect Seniors From Financial Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1253, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1253, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1253, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1253, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |