CO HB1251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the scheduled repeal of reports by higher education agencies to the general assembly.
Title
Reporting Requirements By Higher Education Agencies To General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1251 to the Committee of the Whole consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1251 to the Committee of the Whole consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/17/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |