CO HB1250 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a supplemental appropriation to the department of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Law Supplemental

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1250 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1250 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2020-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1250
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1250_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1250_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1250_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1250_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1250_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/06ca5126264bdb2c87258504005ed408-hb20-1250-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1250vote5c9f02
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e5da8e0192982688725850b005827db-hb20-1250-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1250vote5cface

Bill Comments

feedback