CO HB1250 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning sex offenses committed by a peace officer, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Assault While In Custody Or Detained

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1250 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1250 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-30SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1250
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1250_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1250_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1250_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1250_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1250_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1250_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd827adcab66a963872583c4006bc4ae-hb19-1250-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd827adcab66a963872583c4006bc4ae-hb19-1250-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/31a0ed4cc9db5f0f872583da004cb678-hb19-1250-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/31a0ed4cc9db5f0f872583da004cb678-hb19-1250-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1250vote5b8e49
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2807637b6508cae872583e400760483-hb19-1250-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/61ed1d4574480799872583e6004ba4c3-hb19-1250-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1250vote69c3f7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1250vote038750
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1250vote037582

Bill Comments

feedback