CO HB1250 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an analysis to improve compliance with departmental rules by regulated businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Analysis To Improve Compliance With Rules By Businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1250 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Governor Signed
2018-04-26 Sent to the Governor
2018-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-04-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-03-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2018-03-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-23HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-03-22HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-21HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-20HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1250
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1250_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1250_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1250_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1250_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1250_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1250_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-03-15t133301z-hb18-1250-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-03-15t133301z-hb18-1250-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-03-15t133301z-hb18-1250-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1250vote5b98e1
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-04-11t140219z-hb18-1250-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1250vote5421e7

Bill Comments

feedback