CO HB1250 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Suppl Approp Dept Of Revenue

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suppl Approp Dept Of Revenue

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1250 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1250 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseGovernor Signed
2016-03-01HouseSent to the Governor
2016-03-01HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-02-25HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-02-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-18SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-17SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-02-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2016-02-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-02-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-02-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4240F3D118BC1287257F240065011D?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4240F3D118BC1287257F240065011D/$FILE/1250_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4240F3D118BC1287257F240065011D/$FILE/1250_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4240F3D118BC1287257F240065011D/$FILE/1250_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4240F3D118BC1287257F240065011D/$FILE/1250_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4240F3D118BC1287257F240065011D/$FILE/1250_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4240F3D118BC1287257F240065011D/$FILE/1250_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4240F3D118BC1287257F240065011D/$FILE/1250_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2346BAAFC2985BBE87257F540054154D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/F9A7F8F7D50F323887257F5600596ACD/$FILE/Fb11.pdf#196
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6F4E3A435693AC5087257F5C00537EBF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/A926A62986E4677987257F5E005357FC/$FILE/jour_038.pdf#240
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2346BAAFC2985BBE87257F540054154D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6F4E3A435693AC5087257F5C00537EBF

Bill Comments

feedback