CO HB1248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to promote transparency about the activities of persons lobbying state government officials, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Lobbyist Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1248 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1248, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1248, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1248 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1248, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1248, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |