CO HB1247 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a study by the commissioner of agriculture on the potential applications for blockchain technology in agricultural operations.
Title
Study Agricultural Applications For Blockchain
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.007) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1247 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1247, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.007) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1247 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1247, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture + Appropriations |