CO HB1245 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a prohibition against a mental health care provider engaging in conversion therapy with a patient under eighteen years of age.
Title
Prohibit Conversion Therapy Mental Health Provider
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1245 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1245 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1245 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1245 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1245 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/04/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/03/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |