CO HB1245 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Continue Boxing Commission
Title
Sunset Continue Boxing Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-26 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-03-22 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2010-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-19 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-16 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |