CO HB1244 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the peace officers mental health support grant program, and, in connection therewith, allowing certain agencies to apply for grants from the program and expanding the permissible uses of money awarded as grants under the program.
Title
Expand Peace Officer Mental Health Support Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.005) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.005) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |