CO HB1242 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of an agricultural drought and climate resilience office in the department of agriculture, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create Agricultural Drought And Climate Resilience Office

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-05-25SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-05-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-05-21SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-13SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-04-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 04/21/2021 - No Amendments
2021-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-05HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2021-03-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1242
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1242_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1242_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1242_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1242_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1242_rer.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1242_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1242_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1242_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1242_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1242_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1242_L.008.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1242_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1242_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1242_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1242_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/834386eda6c46ebf872586b1005bad76-hb21-1242-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/834386eda6c46ebf872586b1005bad76-hb21-1242-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/834386eda6c46ebf872586b1005bad76-hb21-1242-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1242vote54591d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b6e307c505a6e5cd872586d400734fa7-house-bill-21-1242-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bd554b22db76f084872586dc004eeea8-hb21-1242-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bd554b22db76f084872586dc004eeea8-hb21-1242-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1242vote5d117d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1242vote5d2b58
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1242vote165022
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1242vote1661bb

Bill Comments 750

feedback