CO HB1242 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Patient Caregiver Designation Hospital Requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Caregiver Designation Hospital Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachement D) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-08HouseGovernor Signed
2015-04-28HouseSent to the Governor
2015-04-28HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-04-22HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2015-04-22HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-14SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-13SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-08SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-03-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2015-03-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-24HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-03-20HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-02-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4/$FILE/1242_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4/$FILE/1242pubhe_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4/$FILE/1242_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4/$FILE/1242_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4/$FILE/1242shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4/$FILE/1242_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4/$FILE/1242_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/47497494C2223E8E87257DCC005B9CE4/$FILE/1242_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D6C92A1452439CDC87257E0E006D34AE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/09D16C8702D5CA7E87257E0E006D007B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B737351DFAAB169487257E21005B491C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CC1F581D15966DCF87257E21005AEB50
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7DE1656D8C21611A87257E21005AEF3A

Bill Comments

feedback