CO HB1242 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal Mandatory Sentence Bail Condition Violation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Mandatory Sentence Bail Condition Violation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1242 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1242 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1242 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1242 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-28HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-21HouseSent to the Governor
2013-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-05-03SenateSenate Second Reading Passed
2013-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-04-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2013-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2013-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-03-26HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2013-02-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/321FC6D97AA4F62E87257B020072EA03?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/321FC6D97AA4F62E87257B020072EA03/$FILE/1242_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/321FC6D97AA4F62E87257B020072EA03/$FILE/1242_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/321FC6D97AA4F62E87257B020072EA03/$FILE/1242_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/321FC6D97AA4F62E87257B020072EA03/$FILE/1242_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/321FC6D97AA4F62E87257B020072EA03/$FILE/1242_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/321FC6D97AA4F62E87257B020072EA03/$FILE/1242_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6995386B9083B0A087257B3A006E0846
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8FE206BA39BF3BE587257B4800698605
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/16AF94D046ABA22687257B5E006E462A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6995386B9083B0A087257B3A006E0846
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8FE206BA39BF3BE587257B4800698605
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/16AF94D046ABA22687257B5E006E462A

Bill Comments 750

feedback