CO HB1237 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning licensing behavioral health entities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing Behavioral Health Entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading End Debate (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1237 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Reconsider amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt substitute amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment to amendment L.001 (Attachment B), line 13, strike '2012', and insert '2021'. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001, as amended (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1237, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-18HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1237
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1237_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1237_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1237_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1237_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1237_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/54ea51201f89e8bb872583ca005997bf-hb19-1237-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36a96c9f0c443b7c872583d700018a8c-hb19-1237-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/54ea51201f89e8bb872583ca005997bf-hb19-1237-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/54ea51201f89e8bb872583ca005997bf-hb19-1237-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/54ea51201f89e8bb872583ca005997bf-hb19-1237-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f3a7b3f77c876847872583de004bd4a4-hb19-1237-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b58c4aa2ba9e38dd872583e0004ae701-hb19-1237-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b58c4aa2ba9e38dd872583e0004ae701-hb19-1237-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b58c4aa2ba9e38dd872583e0004ae701-hb19-1237-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1237vote56d1da
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0a856add9923f2db872583e800017d8e-hb19-1237-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/78d6238eebff84ee872583e900091525-hb19-1237-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/78d6238eebff84ee872583e900091525-hb19-1237-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1237vote1d04a9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1237vote088b30
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1237vote70d193
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1237vote70bd13

Bill Comments

feedback