CO HB1233 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning payment system reforms to reduce health care costs by increasing utilization of primary care, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investments In Primary Care To Reduce Health Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1233 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Conceptual amendment 1, strike "Nonprofit," on line 2 of amendment L.009 (Attachment A). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Governor Signed
2019-04-30SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1233
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1233_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1233_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1233_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1233_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1233_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3e474b9b3f03f4e4872583c9006f91d2-hb19-1233-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3e474b9b3f03f4e4872583c9006f91d2-hb19-1233-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3e474b9b3f03f4e4872583c9006f91d2-hb19-1233-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3e474b9b3f03f4e4872583c9006f91d2-hb19-1233-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3e474b9b3f03f4e4872583c9006f91d2-hb19-1233-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f41ad8337c9e9ec4872583da004c6931-hb19-1233-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f41ad8337c9e9ec4872583da004c6931-hb19-1233-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1233vote5cd993
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/202380d1891458e9872583e10056fb8b-hb19-1233-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e063dbca67fd01b8872583e6004b84a5-hb19-1233-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1233vote6d9d2c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1233vote02a981
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1233vote02be30
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/202380d1891458e9872583e10056fb8b-hb19-1233-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/202380d1891458e9872583e10056fb8b-hb19-1233-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback