CO HB1233 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning payment system reforms to reduce health care costs by increasing utilization of primary care, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Investments In Primary Care To Reduce Health Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1233 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Conceptual amendment 1, strike "Nonprofit," on line 2 of amendment L.009 (Attachment A). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1233 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Conceptual amendment 1, strike "Nonprofit," on line 2 of amendment L.009 (Attachment A). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |