CO HB1233 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Respite Care Study Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Respite Care Study Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment conceptual amendment to remove appropriation clause. Strike section 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-29HouseGovernor Signed
2015-05-14HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-13HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-04-30HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2015-04-30HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-22SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-04-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2015-04-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-03-31HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-02-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233pubhe_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233ssta_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233sstaapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/43177EAB7A248E2187257D9000766434/$FILE/1233_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/015648C2708804F287257E19007DCC84
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/68BC5581F1BC1FCD87257E23004DB78B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/606A95856090437E87257E23004D9957
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/438792DB32CE9B3687257E19007D66F7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/42245253BDF04D6087257E19007D4915
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/26C13F3F056EF56A87257E19007D8115
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8A18C5FED888B17487257E2F00703ACD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A433CC6FA7C2042887257E31004D50FA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/55F4D642BB81591B87257E31004D7C2D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8A18C5FED888B17487257E2F00703ACD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E41EDA54ABD0AD0F87257E3D005DC247
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6E72F501E1120D6B87257E3D005DAB72

Bill Comments

feedback