CO HB1229 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorizing the peace officers standards and training board to establish a scholarship program for law enforcement agencies with limited resources to assist the agencies with the payment of tuition costs for peace officer candidates to attend an approved basic law enforcement training academy.
Title
Peace Officers Standards and Training Board Scholarship Rural And Small Law Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Recede (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1229 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Recede (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1229 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-05-26 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |