CO HB1226 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Pending: Senate Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning changes to release on bond, and, in connection therewith, the development of a pretrial screening process and administrative order for release without any monetary conditions; creating a presumption of release with the least restrictive conditions and without monetary conditions; specifying the information the court considers when making determinations about type of bond and conditions of release; a requirement for pretrial services programs throughout the state; and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bond Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1226, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.029 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.024 (Attachment L). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment M). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment N). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment H). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.023 (Attachment K). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.027 (Attachment O). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1226, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1226, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1226, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1226, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1226, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-22HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-09HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-03-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1226
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1226_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1226_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1226_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8b088387c687c039872583d7006b9a6b-hb19-1226-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8b088387c687c039872583d7006b9a6b-hb19-1226-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8b088387c687c039872583d7006b9a6b-hb19-1226-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8b088387c687c039872583d7006b9a6b-hb19-1226-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8b088387c687c039872583d7006b9a6b-hb19-1226-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8b088387c687c039872583d7006b9a6b-hb19-1226-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dadacc5d98662ec3872583e1004b2b7e-hb19-1226-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dadacc5d98662ec3872583e1004b2b7e-hb19-1226-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1226vote5a2061
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e983866c4215b5f5872583ed004ea42f-hb19-1226-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e983866c4215b5f5872583ed004ea42f-hb19-1226-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e983866c4215b5f5872583ed004ea42f-hb19-1226-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-8-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/310dbcf12f5f5ac8872583ec00116d85-hb19-1226-4-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback