CO HB1224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning providing free menstrual hygiene products to people in custody.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Free Menstrual Hygiene Products In Custody

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25 Governor Signed
2019-04-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-01SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-03-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1224
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1224_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1224_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1224_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1224_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1224_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1224_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/154223197e03986d872583be0004ddef-hb19-1224-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1224vote5757b3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/154223197e03986d872583be0004ddef-hb19-1224-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/154223197e03986d872583be0004ddef-hb19-1224-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1bfc02f6e7c5154872583cf006c51d7-hb19-1224-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1224vote55dd6d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1224vote5c8233
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1224vote5c9561
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1bfc02f6e7c5154872583cf006c51d7-hb19-1224-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1bfc02f6e7c5154872583cf006c51d7-hb19-1224-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback