CO HB1224 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creation Of A Consolidated Communications System
Title
Creation Of A Consolidated Communications System
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Becker [R] | Sen. Kent Lambert [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - LO for Action Only (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - LO for Action Only (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - LO for Action Only (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - LO for Action Only (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-03-28 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-16 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations | |
2012-02-28 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-27 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation |