CO HB1223 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the outdoor recreation industry office in the office of economic development.
Title
Create Outdoor Recreation Industry Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1223 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1223 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |