CO HB1223 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reclassify Dolores County As Category V County
Title
Reclassify Dolores County As Category V County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1223 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1223 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (not allowed) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (not allowed) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1223 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (not allowed) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (not allowed) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |