CO HB1222 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - House Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - House Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
PUC Member Accountability to Public
Title
PUC Member Accountability to Public
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments | |
2011-04-11 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-06 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-23 | House Committee on Transportation Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation |