CO HB1217 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the governance structure of the state historical society.
Title
State Historical Society Governance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1217 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1217 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |