CO HB1217 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Gov Input Liquor Sales Room Applications
Title
Local Gov Input Liquor Sales Room Applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1217 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations The motion passed on a vote of 9-0. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations The motion passed on a vote of 9-0. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-27 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-04-27 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2015-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |