CO HB1217 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Owner-user Organization Boiler Inspections
Title
Owner-user Organization Boiler Inspections
Sponsors
Sen. Irene Aguilar [D] | Rep. Max Tyler [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1217 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1217 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1217 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1217 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1217 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1217 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1217 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-16 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |