CO HB1215 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning legislative recommendations of the Colorado child support commission, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support Commission Recommendations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1215 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1215 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1215 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Governor Signed
2019-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-20HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-04-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1215
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1215_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1215_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1215_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1215_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1215_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1215_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/96db797c17849738872583be006ffdb9-hb19-1215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/96db797c17849738872583be006ffdb9-hb19-1215-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/45bd199e03459194872583e8004e46e1-hb19-1215-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/45bd199e03459194872583e8004e46e1-hb19-1215-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/45bd199e03459194872583e8004e46e1-hb19-1215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1215vote6aef25
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4ba3ca08af0137a0872583ec0070ee1b-hb19-1215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aed9d84cb8c2d93d872583ed0078b57e-hb19-1215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d97711696631a3a6872583ee005ff434-hb19-1215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1215vote55c6db

Bill Comments

feedback