CO HB1215 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mental health support for peace officers.
Title
Mental Health Support For Peace Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |