CO HB1214 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning increased eligibility for procedures to reduce collateral sanctions experienced by defendants, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Record Sealing Collateral Consequences Reduction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1214 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1214 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.016) (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1214, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1214, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1214 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1214, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Governor Signed
2021-06-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-19SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-05-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-05-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-07HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-20HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1214
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1214_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1214_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1214_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1214_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1214_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1214_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.015.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.014.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1214_L.016.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1214_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1214_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1214_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2a1b8f6d40957e10872586bd0071ae09-hb21-1214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/78eeb9de94c9ce80872586c6005d0ae5-hb21-1214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c0646d9a2bb5482f872586ce0054db27-hb21-1214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c0646d9a2bb5482f872586ce0054db27-hb21-1214-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1214vote541367
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1214vote542f52
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1214vote53f9bf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ed47d78298031dd872586da0081fe63-hb21-1214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e26e97c79a508788872586df004df8aa-hb21-1214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1214vote557637

Bill Comments 750

feedback