CO HB1214 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt A Shelter Pet License Plate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt A Shelter Pet License Plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1214, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1214, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1214 to the Committee on Transportation and Energy (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-09 Governor Action - Signed
2010-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2010-05-25 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-05-25 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-05-11 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2010-05-10 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-05-07 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-05-04 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-04-30 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-04-15 Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2010-03-29 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources + Appropriations
2010-03-25 House Third Reading Passed
2010-03-23 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-19 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-03-02 House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2010-02-23 House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Transportation & Energy
2010-02-01 Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Transportation & Energy + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122/$FILE/1214_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122/$FILE/1214teAPP.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122/$FILE/1214sagr_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122/$FILE/1214_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122/$FILE/1214_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122/$FILE/1214_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122/$FILE/1214_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/F6E8D38113960DAD872576AA00693122/$FILE/1214_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B4E2699D3BC894D0872576D300650DC1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7F51B80C0555EA4C872576DB0006F178
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3B13DC82182AA8CA872576EB004ACC22
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AB381F29CA03B148872577060078C9BC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/17D3DBA7CD724D138725771500502E39

Bill Comments

feedback