CO HB1213 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the distribution of stop the bleed materials to schools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stop The Bleed School Training And Kits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1213 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 23-1213 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 23-1213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-15 Governor Signed
2023-05-05 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-03SenateSenate Recalled Bill From House
2023-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-21SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-04-17SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-04-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2023-04-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-03-22HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2023-02-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb23-1213
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1213_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1213_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1213_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1213_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1213_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1213_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/9B37C6A72D116F778725897A006103F5/HB1213_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/0592B9484078EE8A87258989005EF8F2/HB1213_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/B47AC156D9BE3D9487258989005EEC97/HB1213_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1213_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1213_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1213_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1213_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1213_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f91c3e1a7e8adfd08725897a006b1292-hb23-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f91c3e1a7e8adfd08725897a006b1292-hb23-1213-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a6d92a644021e8968725898d0054afdb-hb23-1213-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a6d92a644021e8968725898d0054afdb-hb23-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a6d92a644021e8968725898d0054afdb-hb23-1213-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1213vote79ae21
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6ccf34ac40d87cb987258994006e1254-hb23-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8bc604d4f01d92ba8725899800597700-hb23-1213-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1213vote5bce34

Bill Comments

feedback