CO HB1213 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office Of Information Technology Modifications
Title
Office Of Information Technology Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1213 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1213 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1213 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2015-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |