CO HB1212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the diversity of members appointed by the governor to boards authorized by the general assembly.
Title
Diversity Of Governor's Appointments To Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |