CO HB1210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of the prohibitions on a local government establishing minimum wage laws within its jurisdiction.
Title
Local Government Minimum Wage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.014) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.025 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.020 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.027 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.014) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.025 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.020 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.027 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/22/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2019-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |