CO HB1209 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-06 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Pending: Senate Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-06 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Pending: Senate Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the analysis of a universal health-care system, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Analyze Statewide Publicly Financed Health-care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment Q). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment P). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment O). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment N). (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment Q). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment P). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment O). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment N). (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2023-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |