CO HB1209 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the nurse-physician advisory task force for Colorado health care, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies, specifying the type of physician organization to be represented on the task force, and making an appropriation.
Title
Sunset Nurse-physician Advisory Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1209 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1209 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-12 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2020-03-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |