CO HB1209 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning amendments to the state income tax deduction for contributions to a qualified 529 account to ensure that the state income tax deduction is not aligned with the changes in the federal "Tax Cuts and Jobs Act" of 2017 that allow tax-free distributions for elementary and secondary school expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No 529 Account Income Tax Deduction For K-12 Kindergarten Through Twelfth Expenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Postpone House Bill 18-1209 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Postpone House Bill 18-1209 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
2018-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2018-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/13/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/09/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-03HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/04/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-02HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/03/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-29HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback