CO HB1209 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voluntary Military Driver's License
Title
Voluntary Military Driver's License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended with recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1209 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1209 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with favorable consideration (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1209 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1209 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with favorable consideration (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations | |
2010-04-07 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-05 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance + Appropriations |