CO HB1208 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of an enterprise that is exempt from the requirements of section 20 of article X of the state constitution to administer a fee-based natural disaster mitigation grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Disaster Mitigation Enterprise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1208 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 as amended by L.010 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-05-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-05HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1208
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1208_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1208_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1208_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1208_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1208_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1208_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1208_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1208_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1208_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1208_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1208_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1208_L.012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1208_L.016.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1208_L.020.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1208_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1208_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1208_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1208_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1208_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/854a026333d44a418725869c006becb8-hb21-1208-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/854a026333d44a418725869c006becb8-hb21-1208-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb9a90396d08ba60872586ae007eb9df-hb21-1208-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4304abae45c4310872586d2004d84f8-hb21-1208-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4304abae45c4310872586d2004d84f8-hb21-1208-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1208vote554399
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cbfa6e3767c550c4872586df007d3960-hb21-1208-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb9a90396d08ba60872586ae007eb9df-hb21-1208-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb9a90396d08ba60872586ae007eb9df-hb21-1208-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb9a90396d08ba60872586ae007eb9df-hb21-1208-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb9a90396d08ba60872586ae007eb9df-hb21-1208-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb9a90396d08ba60872586ae007eb9df-hb21-1208-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cbfa6e3767c550c4872586df007d3960-hb21-1208-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/df99e6e6db99b03f872586e30050a3ab-hb21-1208-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1208vote5eb657
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1208vote18b8c4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1208vote18cabf

Bill Comments 750

feedback