CO HB1208 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the designation of physical therapists as health care providers for the purpose of ensuring compliance with required head trauma guidelines in organized youth athletic activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical Therapists Youth Athletes Head Trauma

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1208 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Governor Signed
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-16SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-11SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-10SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-03-22HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1208
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1208_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1208_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1208_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1208_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1208_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1208_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d6456cf65640759c872583be00640a64-hb19-1208-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1208vote558bfa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d6456cf65640759c872583be00640a64-hb19-1208-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/857208cb380f5050872583d100658349-hb19-1208-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1208vote54412d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1208vote5dc48a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1208vote5dd6cf

Bill Comments

feedback