CO HB1206 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify Charitable Solicitations Act
Title
Modify Charitable Solicitations Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1206 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 16, strike "person" and substitute "paid solicitor" (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 17, strike "person" and substitute "paid solicitor" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 16, strike "person" and substitute "paid solicitor" (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 17, strike "person" and substitute "paid solicitor" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 16, strike "person" and substitute "paid solicitor" (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 17, strike "person" and substitute "paid solicitor" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 16, strike "person" and substitute "paid solicitor" (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 17, strike "person" and substitute "paid solicitor" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-03 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-03 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |