CO HB1201 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning providing home owners in a mobile home park the opportunity to purchase the park under specified circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile Home Park Residents Opportunity To Purchase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Governor Signed
2020-06-16 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-03-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2020-03-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-02HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-25HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1201
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1201_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1201_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1201_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1201_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1201_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1201_rv2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1201_rr2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1201_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e57f565d785e9c4987258513007dd579-hb20-1201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1201vote67cde0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1201vote599fd3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/21a8815466a457038725857400708a75-hb20-1201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1201vote5b52b4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1201vote5ee81d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1201vote5ed047
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e57f565d785e9c4987258513007dd579-hb20-1201-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback