CO HB1200 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-15)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning financial literacy standards for public schools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise Student Financial Literacy Standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1200 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1200 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1200 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22 Governor Signed
2021-06-09 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-06SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2021-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-25HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1200
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1200_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1200_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1200_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1200_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1200_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1200_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1200_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1200_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1200_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1200_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0a3eb150c05ed7ee872586a30071f055-hb21-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b9b84a3c7235c4e7872586c0004f7398-hb21-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b9b84a3c7235c4e7872586c0004f7398-hb21-1200-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1200vote5bd3d2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/da73733ea73b55fe872586cd00779e13-hb21-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c337889f50f11c70872586d5004e763a-hb21-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1200vote542a2e

Bill Comments 750

feedback