CO HB1200 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modification of the laws regulating public benefit corporations, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Update Public Benefit Corporation Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Wist [R] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] | Sen. John Kefalas [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1200 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1200 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1200 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1200 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1200 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1200 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |