CO HB1199 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a process for the ground water commission to use for approving aquifer storage-and-recovery plans, and, in connection therewith, requiring that the ground water commission promulgate rules governing its implementation of the process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aquifer Storage-and-recovery Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1199 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1199, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1199, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Governor Signed
2018-04-04 Sent to the Governor
2018-04-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-04-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
2018-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1199
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1199_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1199_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1199_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1199_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1199_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1199_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-02-26t133051z-hb18-1199-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1199vote5b568e
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-02-26t133051z-hb18-1199-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-03-22t133010z-hb18-1199-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1199vote547c71

Bill Comments

feedback