CO HB1198 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the powers and duties of the electric vehicle grant fund.
Title
Electric Vehicle Grant Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2019-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Appropriations |